EP3927493 - A DEVICE FOR CHANGING ABRADING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirka Ltd Pensalavägen 210 66850 Jepua / FI | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDSTRÖM, Caj Kyrkvägen 54 66850 Jeppo / FI | 02 /
KAHARI, Jani Strandgatan 13 A 17 65100 Vasa / FI | 03 /
STORBJÖRK, Andreas Bölevägen 8 bst 15 65610 Korsholm / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
NORDSTRÖM, Caj 66850 Jeppo / FI | ||
02 /
KAHARI, Jani 65100 Vasa / FI | |||
03 /
STORBJÖRK, Andreas 65610 Korsholm / FI | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20759032.4 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020FI50094 | Priority number, date | FI20190005131 | 20.02.2019 Original published format: FI 20195131 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020169882 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927493 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B45/00, B23Q3/155, B24B27/00, B24D9/08, B24B41/04, B24B23/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B24B41/005 (EP);
B24B45/006 (FI,US);
B24B23/005 (FI,US);
B23Q3/155 (FI);
B24B27/0038 (EP);
B24B41/04 (EP,FI,US);
B24B45/00 (EP);
B24B57/00 (FI);
B24D9/085 (EP);
B25J19/0066 (FI,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN VON SCHLEIFPRODUKTEN | [2021/52] | English: | A DEVICE FOR CHANGING ABRADING PRODUCTS | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CHANGER DES PRODUITS ABRASIFS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004048549 (BEAUDOIN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0019] , [0025]; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]CN107214620 (YUYI INTELLIGENT TECH (SHANGHAI) CO LTD) [X] 1,3,7 * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,4-6,8-11 | International search | [A]US2004048549 (BEAUDOIN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * whole document *; | [A]AT512464B (SPS HOLDING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2015125068 (MACHINALE S R L FAB [IT]) [A] 1-6 * whole document *; | [A]US2015328734 (MULTHAMMER HANS-JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-6* page 3, paragraph [0061] - page 4, paragraph [0073]; figures 6-10 *; | [X]CN107214620 (YUYI INTELLIGENT TECH (SHANGHAI) CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 & abstracts [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI & machine translation into English by EPO [online] EPOQUENET TXPCNEA especially page 3 *; | [Y]WO2017174512 (FERROBOTICS COMPLIANT ROBOT TECH GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1, 3 * whole document, especially abstract; figures 4A-7D *; | [Y]US2019001460 (STAUBLI REMO [CH]) [Y] 1, 3 * whole document, especially page 6, paragraph [0090] - page 7, paragraph [0096]; figure 4 * |