EP3930164 - DIRECT-CURRENT VOLTAGE CONVERSION CIRCUIT AND SWITCHING POWER SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alps Alpine Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-otsukamachi Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMOTO, Mitsunao c/o ALPS ALPINE CO., LTD., 1-7, Yukigaya- otsukamachi, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
FUJIMOTO, Mitsunao Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20759112.4 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP06658 | Priority number, date | JP20190030060 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019030060 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171148 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930164 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930164 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/00, H02M1/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H02M3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMSPANNUNGSUMWANDLUNGSSCHALTUNG UND SCHALTNETZTEIL | [2021/52] | English: | DIRECT-CURRENT VOLTAGE CONVERSION CIRCUIT AND SWITCHING POWER SOURCE DEVICE | [2021/52] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION DE TENSION CONTINUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION À DÉCOUPAGE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2021 | Translation filed | 11.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016294294 (YE LIMING [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074]; figures 2,6,7 *; | [Y]CN106329940 (UNIV JIANGNAN, et al) [Y] 5* and the corresponding part of the description;; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN107017781 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [Y] 1-4,6 * and the corresponding part of the description;; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2008079454 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [A] 1-6; | [A]US2008130328 (CHOI HANG SEOK [KR])[A] 1-6; | [A]US2016294294 (YE LIMING [US], et al) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2017199628 (UNIV KOBE, et al) [A] 1-6 | by applicant | JP2000232781 | JP2011160616 |