EP3929330 - WATER ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS, AND STERILIZATION/CLEANING METHOD AND METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING/REMOVING HARMFUL SUBSTANCE, EACH USING WATER ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kogakuin University 1-24-2, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8677 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Fumio c/o KOGAKUIN UNIVERSITY, 1-24-2, Nishi-shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8677 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
OKADA, Fumio Tokyo 163-8677 / JP | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20759823.6 | 25.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP07520 | Priority number, date | JP20190031029 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019031029 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171238 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929330 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/13, C25B9/00, C25B11/03, C25B13/02, C02F1/461 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C25B1/30 (EP);
C25B15/08 (US);
C02F1/46104 (EP,US);
C25B1/13 (EP);
C25B11/03 (EP);
C25B11/031 (US);
C25B11/036 (US);
C25B11/044 (US);
C25B13/02 (EP);
C25B13/08 (US);
C25B9/15 (EP);
C25B9/19 (EP,US);
C25B9/60 (US);
C02F1/722 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F2001/46133 (EP);
C02F2101/16 (EP);
C02F2101/18 (EP);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46135 (EP);
C02F2201/46145 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP);
C02F2303/22 (EP);
C02F2305/023 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | C25B1/13, C25B1/10, C25B9/00, C25B9/10, C25B11/03, C25B11/06, C25B11/10, C25B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | WASSERELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG UND STERILISATIONS-/REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZERSETZEN/ENTFERNEN VON SCHÄDLICHEN SUBSTANZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DER WASSERELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/52] | English: | WATER ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS, AND STERILIZATION/CLEANING METHOD AND METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING/REMOVING HARMFUL SUBSTANCE, EACH USING WATER ELECTROLYSIS APPARATUS | [2021/52] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU, ET PROCÉDÉ DE STÉRILISATION/NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉCOMPOSER/ÉLIMINER UNE SUBSTANCE NOCIVE UTILISANT CHACUN UN APPAREIL D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | Translation filed | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.06.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2001300561 (SHIODA HIROICHI) [X] 2,3,17,18 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 12] , [0 24] * [A] 1[I] 4-16; | [XAI] - OKADA FUMIO ET AL, "Production of 160?mg/L ozone water using circulating water electrolysis system", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 294, doi:10.1016/j.electacta.2018.10.055, ISSN 0013-4686, (20181015), pages 391 - 397, Internet, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0013468618322941/pdfft?md5=0706f3b435f0756ce38005a218f7ee86&pid=1-s2.0-S0013468618322941-main.pdf, (20221111), XP055980360 [X] 1,4,9 * figures 1, 2 * * 2.1 Apparatus; page 392 * [A] 2,3,5-8,10-14 [I] 15-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2018.10.055 | International search | [Y]JPS6187503U (SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO., LTD.) [Y] 8-33 * pp. 1-5, fig. 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2006124750 (TOKAI RYOKAKU TETSUDO KK) [Y] 5-33 * paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]JP2012246553 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND ENVIRONMENTAL & CHEMICAL ENG CO LTD) [Y] 6-33 * paragraphs [0001]-[0075], fig. 2 *; | [Y]WO2014115383 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 26-33* paragraphs [0001]-[0016] *; | [Y]WO2017006837 (AQUAECOS LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 26-33 * paragraphs [0001]-[0002] *; | [XY]JP2018076575 (UNIV KOGAKUIN) [X] 1-4, 12-21, 24-25 * paragraphs [0001]-[0162], fig. 1-3 * [Y] 5-33 | by applicant | JP2017165651 | JP2018076575 | JP2019031029 | JP2019042628 |