EP3927172 - MICROBIAL CONVERSION OF LACTOSE-CONTAINING FEEDSTOCKS TO CARBOXYLIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capro-X, Inc. 116 W. Green Street Ithaca NY 14850 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUZMAN, Juan J., Jr. 116 W. Green Street Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
GUZMAN, Juan J., Jr. Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20759994.5 | 24.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US19534 | Priority number, date | US201962809685P | 24.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962809685 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020172675 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927172 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/40, C12P7/56, C12P7/52, C12P39/00, A23C21/02, A23C9/127 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A23C9/127 (EP);
A23C21/02 (EP);
C12P39/00 (EP);
C12P7/40 (EP);
C12P7/52 (EP);
C12P7/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | A23C21/02, C07C51/00, C08G63/08, C12P1/04, G01N33/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | MIKROBIELLE UMWANDLUNG VON LAKTOSE-ENTHALTENDEN AUSGANGSSTOFFEN IN CARBONSÄUREN | [2021/52] | English: | MICROBIAL CONVERSION OF LACTOSE-CONTAINING FEEDSTOCKS TO CARBOXYLIC ACIDS | [2021/52] | French: | CONVERSION MICROBIENNE DE CHARGES CONTENANT DU LACTOSE EN ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018029219 (GLANBIA IRELAND DAC [IE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 31 *; | [Y] - XU JIAJIE ET AL, "Temperature-Phased Conversion of Acid Whey Waste Into Medium-Chain Carboxylic Acids via Lactic Acid: No External e-Donor", JOULE, CELL PRESS, (20180221), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JOULE.2017.11.008, ISSN 2542-4351, pages 280 - 295, XP009511360 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 283, 286 - page 287 * * page 290 - page 291 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joule.2017.11.008 | [Y] - SORIANO-PEREZ SONIA ET AL, "Production of lactic acid from cheese whey by batch cultures of Lactobacillus helveticus", ANALS OF MICROBIOLOGY, IT, vol. 62, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s13213-011-0264-z, ISSN 1590-4261, (20120301), pages 313 - 317, URL: https://annalsmicrobiology.biomedcentral.com/counter/pdf/10.1007/s13213-011-0264-z.pdf, XP055973735 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 314 - page 315 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13213-011-0264-z | International search | [XY] - XU et al., "Temperature-Phased Conversion of Acid Whey Waste Into Medium-Chain Carboxylic Acids via Lactic Acid: No External e-Donor", Joule, vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.joule.2017.11.008, (20180221), pages 280 - 295, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S2542435117301794, (20200407), XP009511360 [X] 1, 10 [Y] 2, 3, 11-13, 18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joule.2017.11.008 | [Y] - NAJAFPOUR et al., "Biological Treatment of Dairy Wastewater in an Upflow Anaerobic Sludge-Fixed Film Bioreactor", American -Eurasian J. Agric. & Environ. Sci., (20080000), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 251 - 257, XP028395928 [Y] 2, 3, 11-13, 18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2011.12.062 |