Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020270648 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016801388 | 26.02.2020 | WO2020US19534 | 24.02.2020 | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113543647 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US19534 | 24.02.2020 | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3130111 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | C | CA3130111 | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US19534 | 24.02.2020 | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020224691B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2022 | B2 | AU2020224691 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US19534 | 24.02.2020 | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3927172 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2022 | A4 | EP3927172 | 29.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US19534 | 24.02.2020 | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020172675 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962809685 | 24.02.2019 |