EP3928575 - TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY ENHANCEMENT FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiaoyu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
WU, Liangming 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
HAO, Chenxi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
HUANG, Min 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 08 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 09 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
LI, Qiaoyu San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
WEI, Chao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Yu San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Liangming San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
HAO, Chenxi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
06 /
HUANG, Min San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
07 /
XU, Hao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
08 /
CHEN, Wanshi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
09 /
MONTOJO, Juan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20759995.2 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020CN74412 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN75589 | 20.02.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/075589 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020168922 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928575 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04B7/0456, H04B7/0404, H04B7/0408 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04B7/0404 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04B7/0604 (EP);
H04B7/0691 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSDIVERSITÄTSVERSTÄRKUNG FÜR EINEN UPLINK-STEUERKANAL | [2021/52] | English: | TRANSMISSION DIVERSITY ENHANCEMENT FOR UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL | [2021/52] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE DIVERSITÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR CANAL DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Transmit diversity and resource allocation for PUCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1716317 INTEL TXD RA PUCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051339773 [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 11 | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Long PUCCH over multiple slots", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1720684 LONG PUCCH OVER MULTIPLE SLOTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F91/Docs/, (20171118), XP051370145 [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 11 | [XI] - ZTE ET AL, "Diversity based uplink transmission schemes", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715433 DIVERSITY BASED UPLINK TRANSMISSION SCHEMES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051338901 [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 11 | [A] - ERICSSON, "On PUCCH Resource Allocation and Other Open Aspects", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170912), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1716590, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/, (20170912), XP051330121 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004087282 (ISHIKAWA KIMIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012020331 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013153276 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103378937 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [X]EP2731391 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-30 * claims 1-19, description, paragraphs 0026-0097, figures 1a-2c * | by applicant | - INTEL CORPORATION, "Transmit diversity and resource allocation for PUCCH", R1-1716317 | - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Long PUCCH over multiple slots", R1-1720684 | - ZTESANECHIPS, "Diversity based uplink transmission schemes", R1-1715433 |