EP3913814 - SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUIT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Himchan 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Kyungjae 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Soonho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/52] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
YUN, Himchan Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Kyungjae Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
HWANG, Soonho Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20760307.7 | 18.02.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020KR02292 | Priority number, date | KR20190019507 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190019507 | [2021/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171528 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913814 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913814 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04B1/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/3827 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSCHALTUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/47] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUIT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2021/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT CE DERNIER | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | Translation filed | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | MC | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
IT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
PL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SK | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
PT | 29.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]KR20110037223 (LS MTRON LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 4-6,14,15 [Y] 8,9; | [Y]US2013069737 (SEE PUAY HOE [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0101]; figures 9, 10 *; | [IA]US2017019137 (PARKHURST RAY [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7,10-13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 3A * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figures 5a,5b * [A] 4-6,8,9,14,15; | [A]US2018062249 (SUNG SANG BONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0102]; figures 5A-5D * | International search | [A]KR101133629B (LS MTRON LTD.) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0028]-[0034]; and figure 3. *; | [A]KR20140000814 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0032] and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20150002347 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0045]; and claims 1, 4. *; | [A]KR20180010957 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0003] ; and claims 1-6. *; | [A]US2018034135 (KWAK YONG SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0107]-[0118]; and claim 1. * |