EP3884114 - POSITION DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING THE POSITION OF A BUCKET OF AN EXCAVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicontrol ApS Helgavej 26 5230 Odense M / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Unicontrol APS Helgavej 26 5230 Odense M / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTVIG ANDERSEN, Kasper Højgårdsvej 27 Hundstrup 5762 Vester Skerninge / DK | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Andreasen, Søren Laursen Vasegaard Tropa ApS Aagade 97, 1st Floor 8370 Hadsten / DK | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 20760387.9 | 11.08.2020 | [2021/39] | WO2020DK50231 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA00955 | 13.08.2019 Original published format: DK PA201900955 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028002 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884114 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/38, E02F3/43, E02F9/26 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
E02F9/264 (EP,CN,DK,US);
E02F3/36 (CN);
E02F3/325 (US);
E02F3/34 (DK);
E02F3/384 (EP,US);
E02F3/435 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONSERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN DER POSITION EINES BAGGERLÖFFELS | [2021/39] | English: | POSITION DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING THE POSITION OF A BUCKET OF AN EXCAVATOR | [2021/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE LA POSITION D'UN GODET D'UNE EXCAVATRICE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 16.12.2021 | Stay of proceedings | [2022/08] | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA2635148 (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 4,5 * figure.sign. 50,52,54 paragraphs. 7-10;; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US7925439 (MCCAIN STEVEN DANIEL [US]) [X] 1,6-10,13,19 * fig.sign. 100, 103,201-205,707-709;; figures 2,7 *; | [XY]US2011311342 (MONTGOMERY JAMES LEONARD [US]) [X] 1,6-10,13-19 * fig.sign. 12,14,24,26,28,34,70,80 paragraphs. 6,33,47-50,77; pages 7,8 * [Y] 2-5,11,12; | [Y]JP2013117139 (SATO KOGYO) [Y] 2-4,11,12 * figure.sign. 18 paragraphs. 13,23,33,35;; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2013164105 (SCHERF WILFRIED [DE], et al)[A] 2-4,11,12; | [A]WO2014167722 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6-10 |