EP3980395 - 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE (1233XF) COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Xuehui 761 Meadowbank Road Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | 02 /
KRAUSE, Karl Robert 572 Unionville Road Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | 03 /
JACKSON, Andrew 2 Thomas Lane North Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20760976.9 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020US35817 | Priority number, date | US201962857082P | 04.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962857082 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020247423 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980395 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/087, C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C21/18, C07C19/10, C09K3/30 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
C07C21/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C17/087 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C17/206 (EP,CN);
C07C19/10 (CN,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/10 (CN,EP);
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (CN,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | 2-CHLOR-3,3,3-TRIFLUORPROPEN (1233XF)-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/15] | English: | 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE (1233XF) COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE COMPOSITIONS | [2022/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPÈNE (1233XF) ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 03.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2080748 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | [XI]WO2009137658 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [XI]WO2011102538 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [XI]US2012215935 (WOODS RANDY [US]); | [XI]WO2014025065 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [XI]WO2017129878 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | by applicant | US4978649 | US5136113 | US5155082 | WO2007079431 | US2009182179 | US2011270000 | US2012078020 | CN103483142 | CN105218297 | US2016023972 | JP2017014160 | WO2019203318 | US19820628570 |