Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022298522 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017631510 | 29.07.2020 | WO2020IL50835 | 29.07.2020 | US201962880136 | 30.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL290173 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020IL50835 | 29.07.2020 | US201962880136 | 30.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3148950 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020IL50835 | 29.07.2020 | US201962880136 | 30.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4004212 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020IL50835 | 29.07.2020 | US201962880136 | 30.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021019536 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962880136 | 30.07.2019 |