EP4025506 - PACKAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PACKAGING UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASTNER, Michael Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
GABLER, Markus Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
GUT, Tobias Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 04 /
HENSEL, Thomas Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 05 /
HUBER, Wolfgang Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 06 /
KIRZINGER, Johannes Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 07 /
KOLLMUSS, Manuel Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 08 /
LUBER, Johann Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 09 /
SPINDLER, Herbert Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 10 /
STADLER, Thomas Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20761803.4 | 25.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP73734 | Priority number, date | DE201910123831 | 05.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019123831 | DE202010109632 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020109632 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043632 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025506 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/02, B65B17/02, B65B21/06, B65D71/50 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
B65B17/025 (EP);
B65B13/02 (EP);
B65B17/02 (EP);
B65B21/06 (EP);
B65D71/403 (EP);
B65D71/406 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERPACKUNGSEINHEITEN | [2022/28] | English: | PACKAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PACKAGING UNITS | [2022/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNITÉS D'EMBALLAGE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3239994 (ETZEL GERALD L, et al); | [A]US3674136 (FORRER HOMER W); | [I]US4121401 (DUERR JOSEPH W, et al); | [I]GB2170774 (FEDERAL PAPER BOARD CO INC); | [A]US5088269 (THELEN BRIAN L [US]); | [A]US5167325 (SYKORA JOHN M [US]); | [A]US5775486 (EDQVIST HAAKAN [SE]); | [A]WO02060780 (DOMOKOS JOZSEF [HU]); | [I]EP1522502 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]); | [A]US2013263557 (BATES STEPHEN PAUL [GB]); | [A]US2017190488 (BATES STEPHEN PAUL [GB]) | by applicant | DE1457489 | DE2531325 | DE2206071 | US5775486 | EP1075419 | DE102006028661 | DE202012103324U |