EP4023027 - RADIO LINK MONITORING FOR SIDELINK COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Shuanshuan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SARKIS, Gabi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20762022.0 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US46688 | Priority number, date | US201962893680P | 29.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962893680 P | US202016994116 | 14.08.2020 Original published format: US202016994116 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041079 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023027 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/19, H04W76/14, H04W76/38 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04W76/19 (EP,KR);
H04W24/08 (KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L1/1825 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1867 (EP,KR);
H04L1/188 (EP,KR);
H04W28/0284 (KR);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W76/18 (KR);
H04W92/18 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | FUNKVERBINDUNGSÜBERWACHUNG FÜR SIDELINK-KOMMUNIKATION | [2022/27] | English: | RADIO LINK MONITORING FOR SIDELINK COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/27] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DES LIAISONS RADIO POUR LES COMMUNICATIONS PAR LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2018135677 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XPI]US2019394827 (KIM HEEJIN [KR], et al); |