EP3932424 - RSV F/G CHIMERIC VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KM Biologics Co., Ltd. 1-6-1 Okubo Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUE, Ryo c/o KM Biologics Co., Ltd., Kikuchi Research Center 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 02 /
KAMAKURA, Satoshi c/o KM Biologics Co., Ltd., Kikuchi Research Center 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO, Mihoko c/o KM Biologics Co., Ltd., Kikuchi Research Center 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 04 /
TORIKAI, Masaharu c/o KM Biologics Co., Ltd., Kikuchi Research Center 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 05 /
MORI, Hiroaki c/o KM Biologics Co., Ltd., Kikuchi Research Center 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
YAMAUE, Ryo Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMAKURA, Satoshi Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUO, Mihoko Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | |||
04 /
TORIKAI, Masaharu Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | |||
05 /
MORI, Hiroaki Kikuchi-shi, Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20762080.8 | 27.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020JP08187 | Priority number, date | JP20190036206 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019036206 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020175660 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932424 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/155, A61P31/14, A61P37/04, C07K14/115, C07K19/00, C12N15/45, C12N15/62 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,KR);
A61K39/155 (KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/04 (EP,KR);
C07K16/1027 (EP);
C12N15/62 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/91 (EP);
C12N2760/18522 (EP);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,KR);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | F/G CHIMÄRER VRS-IMPFSTOFF | [2022/01] | English: | RSV F/G CHIMERIC VACCINE | [2022/01] | French: | VACCIN CHIMÉRIQUE F/G CONTRE LE VRS | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | Translation filed | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012093847 (BAUDOUX GUY JEAN MARIE FERNAND PIERRE [BE], et al) | International search | [A]WO2009148194 (SAITO SABURO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2011528222 ; | [X]JP2012530504 ; | [A]US2015166610 (BAUDOUX GUY JEAN MARIE FERNAND PIERRE [BE], et al) | by applicant | JPS588536B | JP4150814B | JP4310184B | JP2010522540 | JP2011528222 | JP2016519658 | WO2016144675 | JP6162751B |