EP3932213 - ACETIC ACID-CONTAINING SEASONING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizkan Holdings Co., Ltd. 6 Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | For all designated states Mizkan Co., Ltd. 6 Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHII, Shotaro c/o MIZKAN CO., LTD. 6, Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Atsuhito c/o MIZKAN CO., LTD. 6, Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
ICHII, Shotaro Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
MIURA, Atsuhito Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20763036.9 | 10.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020JP05080 | Priority number, date | JP20190036185 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019036185 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020175124 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932213 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/21, A23L27/00, A23L2/56, A23L2/66, A23L2/68, C12J1/08, A23L29/30, A23L33/175, A23L33/18 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A23L33/175 (EP);
A23L27/2028 (US);
A23L19/03 (US);
A23L2/56 (EP);
A23L2/66 (EP);
A23L2/68 (EP);
A23L27/21 (EP,US);
A23L27/82 (EP);
A23L27/84 (EP);
A23L27/86 (EP);
A23L29/35 (EP);
A23L33/18 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/022, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0624, A23V2250/063, A23V2250/063, A23V2250/5114 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | A23L27/00, A23L27/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | ESSIGSÄUREHALTIGE WÜRZFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2022/01] | English: | ACETIC ACID-CONTAINING SEASONING LIQUID | [2022/01] | French: | ASSAISONNEMENT LIQUIDE CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ACÉTIQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | Translation filed | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS5867149 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [Y]EP0544377 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al); | [A]EP0812546 (KAWASHIMA TOSHIO [JP]); | [AD]JP2002119241 (RIKEN VITAMIN CO); | [XYI]JP2014200212 (TABLEMARK CO LTD) | International search | [A]JPS5867149 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]JP2002281932 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [XA]JP2014200212 (TABLEMARK CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2002119241 |