EP3933819 - DISPLAY PANEL, DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Hefei Boe Joint Technology Co., Ltd. Block 15 Group-A Zone-E Of Industrial Park In Hefei New Station Xinzhan District Hefei Anhui 230012 / CN | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Xuehuan No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yongqian No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
FENG, Xuehuan Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Yongqian Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20763429.6 | 20.01.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020CN73281 | Priority number, date | CN201910151531 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910151531 | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020173262 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933819 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3266, G09G3/3225 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G11C19/28 (EP);
G09G3/3266 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G11C19/287 (US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (US);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,US);
G09G2310/061 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2022/01] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL, DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD | [2022/01] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | Translation filed | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN108154835 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [XY]CN109166527 (HEFEI JINGDONGFANG ZHUOYIN TECH CO LTD, et al); | [P]US2019206294 (TIAN ZHENGUO [CN], et al); | US2021201804 [ ] (FENG XUEHUAN [CN], et al) | International search | [A]CN106157896 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]CN107657923 (HEFEI XINSHENG OPTOELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2018130402 (BANG JOO HYUK [KR], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2018293944 (KIM JITAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108682398 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-22 * description, paragraphs 2-27, 43-148, figures 1-11 *; | [Y]CN109166529 (HEFEI JINGDONGFANG ZHUOYIN TECH CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-22 * description, paragraphs 2-27, 48-318, figures 1-17 *; | [Y]CN109166527 (HEFEI JINGDONGFANG ZHUOYIN TECH CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-22 * description, paragraphs 2-21, 42-283, figures 1-17 *; | [PX]CN109935212 (HEFEI BOE ZHUOYIN TECH CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-22 * entire document * |