EP4021831 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SORTING POSITIONALLY UNSTABLE ITEMS TO BE SORTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Supply Chain Logistics GmbH Lilienthalstraße 16/18 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2022/27] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENENKEL, Peter Schottenstrasse 71 78462 Konstanz / DE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20764039.2 | 18.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020EP73110 | Priority number, date | EP20190193622 | 26.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19193622 | [2022/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037609 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021831 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G43/08, B65G47/50, B65G47/71, B65G47/84, B65G47/96, B07C3/08 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B65G43/08 (EP,US);
B07C3/08 (EP,US);
B07C5/36 (EP);
B65G47/503 (EP);
B65G47/71 (EP);
B65G47/844 (EP,US);
B65G47/962 (EP);
B65G47/965 (EP);
B65G54/02 (EP);
B65G2201/0285 (EP);
B65G2203/0266 (EP);
B65G2203/0283 (EP,US);
B65G2203/041 (EP);
B65G2203/042 (EP);
B65G2203/044 (EP);
B65G2207/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SORTIEREN VON LAGEINSTABILEN SORTIERSTÜCKEN | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SORTING POSITIONALLY UNSTABLE ITEMS TO BE SORTED | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR TRIER DES ARTICLES À TRIER À POSITION INSTABLE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 08.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19817437 (WOLF MONTAGE AUTOMATIONSANLAGE [DE]) [Y] 10,11,20,21 * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 14 ** column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 1 *; | [XY]WO2008016576 (MOORE JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,12-14,16-18 * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, line 10 - page 32, line 25 * [Y] 10,11,20,21; | [XY]EP2782855 (CRISPLANT AS [DK]) [X] 1-7,9,12-17,19 * claim 1 * * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0097] * [Y] 10,11,20,21; | [XY]WO2016179480 (INTELLIGRATED HEADQUARTERS LLC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,12-15,17,18 * claim 1 * * figures 1-13 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0065] * [Y] 10,11,20,21; | [XY]WO2018169392 (VANDERLANDE IND BV [NL]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,12-15,17,18 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 20 * * page 10, line 31 - page 18, line 26 * [Y] 10,11,20,21; | [Y]CN109013358 (UNIV DONGGUAN TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 10,11,20,21 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document * |