EP4025929 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM, A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM, AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM OF THIS KIND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Str. 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Reimar c/o MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Str. 667 80995 München / DE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20764632.4 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74061 | Priority number, date | DE20191006243 | 04.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019006243 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043676 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025929 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/35, G01S7/41, G01S13/86, G01S13/931, G01S7/40, G06K9/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
G01S13/867 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S7/354 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S7/4013 (EP,KR);
G01S7/414 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F18/251 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ABBIEGEASSISTENZSYSTEMS, ABBIEGEASSISTENZSYSTEM UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN ABBIEGEASSISTENZSYSTEM | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM, A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM, AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A TURNING ASSISTANCE SYSTEM OF THIS KIND | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME D'AIDE AU VIRAGE, SYSTÈME D'AIDE AU VIRAGE ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL SYSTÈME D'AIDE AU VIRAGE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 01.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE202013008112U (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0016] , [ 0048] , [ 0066] , [ 0067] , [ 0078] , [ 0091] - [0094]; figures 1,2A,2B *; | [Y]DE102014009869 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8* paragraphs [0016] , [ 0019] , [ 0021] , [ 0025] *; | [Y]WO2019090276 (VEONEER US INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [ 0020] , [ 0028] , [ 0034] , [ 0039] , [ 0040] , [ 0049] - [0051]; figures 1-4 * |