EP4004247 - PROCESS OF PREPARING A LITHIUM ALUMINUM ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Livent USA Corp. 1818 Market Street Suite 2550, 25th Floor Philadelphia, PA, 19103 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINA, Younes 1915 Vernon Drive Charlotte, NC 28211 / US | 02 /
GREETER, William, Arthur 1514 Laure Alexis Court Dallas, NC 28034 / US | 03 /
MCGEORGE, Barry 16037 Deer River Road Charlotte, NC 28278 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2022/22] | Robin, Yann Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20764810.6 | 22.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43019 | Priority number, date | US201962879308P | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879308 P | US202016933312 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: US202016933312 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021510 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004247 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4004247 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/03, C22C24/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C22C1/03 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C22C24/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHIUM-ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG | [2022/22] | English: | PROCESS OF PREPARING A LITHIUM ALUMINUM ALLOY | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ALLIAGE LITHIUM-ALUMINIUM | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3957532 (SETTLE JACK L, et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, line 23 - line 38 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4632889 (MCMANIS GEORGE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * Example *; | [A]CN104060141 (SICHUAN TIANQI LITHIUM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-28* abstract *; | [A]WO2014194709 (SICHUAN TIANQI LITHIUM IND INC [CN]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * |