EP4028995 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING A QUALITY OF IMAGE CAPTURE OF A SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAREKAMP, Christiaan c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20765046.6 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020EP75045 | Priority number, date | EP20190196992 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19196992 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048107 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028995 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/20, H04N13/00, H04N21/218, G01B11/245, G01C11/02, G01S3/00, G06T7/00 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G01B11/245 (EP,KR);
G06T7/0002 (EP,KR,US);
G01C11/02 (EP,KR);
G06T15/10 (US);
G06T7/50 (KR);
G06T7/55 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
G06T9/00 (US);
H04N21/21805 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
G06T2207/30168 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2210/56 (US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINER QUALITÄT EINER BILDAUFNAHME EINER SZENE | [2022/29] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING A QUALITY OF IMAGE CAPTURE OF A SCENE | [2022/29] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'UNE QUALITÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE D'UNE SCÈNE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 12.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019020433 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2019134979 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IA] - D. SCHARSTEIN ET AL, "A taxonomy and evaluation of dense two-frame stereo correspondence algorithms", STEREO AND MULTI-BASELINE VISION, 2001. (SMBV 2001). PROCEEDINGS. IEEE WORKSHOP ON KAUAI, HI, USA 9-10 DEC. 2001, US, (20010101), doi:10.1109/SMBV.2001.988771, ISBN 978-0-7695-1327-0, pages 131 - 140, XP055559155 [I] 1-4,7-15 * section 5. Evaluation methodology section 6 Experiments and results * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SMBV.2001.988771 |