EP4037519 - FOOTWEAR MIDSOLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING WITH EMBROIDERY MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Fanny Yung c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | 02 /
RAFFAELE, Guillermo c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20765390.8 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020US45941 | Priority number, date | US201962910517P | 04.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910517 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066943 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037519 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4037519 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, D05B81/00, A43D8/02 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A43B13/125 (EP,KR,US);
A43D8/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43D8/18 (US);
A43B13/14 (CN,KR,US);
A43B13/186 (EP);
A43B13/188 (EP);
A43B13/32 (KR,US);
A43B23/0255 (US);
A43B3/00 (CN);
A43D25/047 (CN);
D05B37/04 (US);
D05B81/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTELSOHLE FÜR SCHUHWERK UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/32] | English: | FOOTWEAR MIDSOLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING WITH EMBROIDERY MACHINE | [2022/32] | French: | SEMELLE INTERCALAIRE DE CHAUSSURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION AVEC UNE MACHINE À BRODER | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 17.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP24182970.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015075033 (CROSS TORY M [US], et al); | [A]US2018303197 (CHEN YUCHUNG K [US], et al); | [XAI]US2019014859 (LUEDECKE TOM [US], et al); | [XAI]US2019200699 (GHIOTTI FABIEN FRANCO ANGELO [DE]) |