EP3935172 - T CELL RECEPTORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Health Network 190 Elizabeth Street R. Fraser Elliott Building - Room 1S-417 Toronto, Ontario M5G 2C4 / CA | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Naoto 190 Elizabeth Street R. Fraser Elliott Building Room 1S-417 Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | 02 /
MURATA, Kenji 190 Elizabeth Street R. Fraser Elliott Building Room 1S-417 Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | 03 /
SASO, Kayoko 190 Elizabeth Street R. Fraser Elliott Building Room 1S-417 Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
HIRANO, Naoto Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | ||
02 /
MURATA, Kenji Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | |||
03 /
SASO, Kayoko Toronto, Ontario M5G-2C4 / CA | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20765650.5 | 03.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020IB51813 | Priority number, date | US201962813651P | 04.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962813651 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178744 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935172 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, A61K31/675, A61K31/7076, A61K35/12, A61K35/17, A61K38/20, A61P35/00, C07F9/6584, C07K14/705, C07K14/725, C07K14/74, C07K19/00, C12N15/113, C12N15/12, C12N15/55, C12N15/867, C12N5/0783, C12N5/10, G01N33/566 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/70539 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/57 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,IL);
A61K35/17 (KR);
A61K38/20 (EP,IL);
A61K39/001192 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/464492 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K48/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C12N15/1138 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/62 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (KR);
G01N33/5011 (EP,IL);
G01N33/505 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2318/20 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2320/31 (EP,IL);
C12N2330/50 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/20, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | T-ZELLREZEPTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/02] | English: | T CELL RECEPTORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/02] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2674445 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]); | [Y]WO2009051555 (AKADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL], et al); | [Y]US2012082692 (KOSMATOPOULOS KOSTANTINOS KOSTAS [FR], et al); | International search | [X]WO2010112962 (VAXON BIOTECH [FR], et al); | [X]WO2011140284 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) |