EP3917070 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA, Issei c/o Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
HATANAKA, Issei Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20765713.1 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020JP08464 | Priority number, date | JP20190038376 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019038376 | [2021/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179706 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917070 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/44, H04L9/08, H04L9/14, H04L9/32, H04L12/22, G06F21/60 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04L9/3273 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP);
H04L63/0823 (US);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L63/0869 (EP);
H04L63/0892 (US);
H04L63/168 (EP);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
H04L9/3263 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | H04L9/08, H04L9/14, H04L9/32, H04L12/22, G06F21/44, G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/48] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | Translation filed | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018124606 (MACY MARK IRWIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0032] *; | [XI] - FRANKEL NIST S KRISHNAN ERICSSON S, "IP Security (IPsec) and Internet Key Exchange (IKE) Document Roadmap; rfc6071.txt", IP SECURITY (IPSEC) AND INTERNET KEY EXCHANGE (IKE) DOCUMENT ROADMAP; RFC6071.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20110208), pages 1 - 63, XP015075877 [X] 1,2,5,6 * sections: 3.3.4, 4.1.1, 4.2.1.2, 4.2.2, 4.2.1.4 * [I] 3,4,7,8 | [I] - PALOMARES DANIEL ET AL, "High Availability for IPsec VPN Platforms: ClusterIP Evaluation", 2013 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AVAILABILITY, RELIABILITY AND SECURITY, IEEE, (20130902), doi:10.1109/ARES.2013.25, pages 178 - 187, XP032524211 [I] 1-8 * page 178 - page 181 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ARES.2013.25 | [A] - E. Rescorla, "RFC 8446 - The Transport Layer Security (TLS) Protocol Version 1.3", (20180801), pages 1 - 160, URL: https://tools.ietf.org/html/rfc8446, (20200108), XP055655495 [A] 1-8 * page 6 - page 10 * | [A] - VAN THANH DO ET AL, "Pervasive service access with SIM-based VPN", MOBILE ADHOC AND SENSOR SYSTEMS, 2009. MASS '09. IEEE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091012), ISBN 978-1-4244-5113-5, pages 836 - 841, XP031569271 [A] 1-8 * page 836 - page 840 * | International search | [Y]JP2005223892 (RICOH KK)[Y] 1-8; | [Y]JP2018037888 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-8 |