EP3930756 - LILRB4-BINDING ANTIBODY AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th St. Austin, TX 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th St. Austin TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Naveen c/o The University Of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center 1515 Holcombe Blvd. Houston, TX 77030 / US | 02 /
ALLISON, James, P. c/o The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center 1515 Holcombe Blvd. Houston, TX 77030 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SHARMA, Naveen Houston, TX 77030 / US | ||
02 /
ALLISON, James, P. Houston, TX 77030 / US | Representative(s) | Rückerl, Florian Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20766187.7 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US20651 | Priority number, date | US201962812700P | 01.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962812700 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180789 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930756 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K39/00, C12N15/113, C12N15/13, C07K16/28, G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
G01N2333/70503 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | A61K39/395, A61K39/00, C12N15/113, C12N15/13, C07K16/28, G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | LILRB4-BINDENDER ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/01] | English: | LILRB4-BINDING ANTIBODY AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/01] | French: | ANTICORPS SE LIANT À LILRB4 ET SES MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 05.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006138739 (TOLERRX INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2013033734 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al); | [I]WO2016144728 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | [I]WO2018089300 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2009202544 (SUCIU-FOCA NICOLE [US], et al); | [A]WO2016029079 (WALTER REED ARMY INST OF RES DEPT OF THE ARMY [US], et al); | [A]WO2018148494 (BLUEFIN BIOMEDICINE INC [US]); |