EP3936447 - PAPER CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 18-1, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUISHI, Takumi c/o Tokan Kogyo Co., Ltd., 18-1, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
MITSUISHI, Takumi Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20766292.5 | 06.02.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020JP04641 | Priority number, date | JP20190041047 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019041047 | [2022/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179350 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936447 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/02, B65D3/20 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B65D3/06 (EP);
B65D25/42 (EP);
B65D3/20 (EP);
Y02W30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | PAPIERBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2022/02] | English: | PAPER CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR USING SAME | [2022/02] | French: | RÉCIPIENT EN PAPIER ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | Translation filed | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012286027 (LU WEI [IE], et al) [Y] 1-8* paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063]; figures 17-19; claims 1-34 *; | [Y]JP1559097S (PATENTEE) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JPH0231370Y (SASATOKU PRINTING CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-2, 4-8 * , page 2, right column, lines 11-23, fig. 1, 6-8, page 2, right column, lines 11-23, fig. 1, 6-8 * [A] 3; | [Y]JP2003072733 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0011], fig. 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO2006061629 (AQUASOL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 5-7 * , page 15, line 4 to page 16, line 6, fig. 1, 2 *; | [YA]US2012286027 (LU WEI [IE], et al) [Y] 1-2, 4-8 * , paragraph [0062], fig. 17-19, paragraph [0062], fig. 17-19 * [A] 3; | [YA]JP1559097S (TOKAN KOGYO CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-2, 4-8 * [explanation of articles in design], in particular, [bottom view], [rear view], [plan view], [reference front view], [reference rear view], [reference left-side view], [reference perspective view], [explanation of articles in design], [drawings], [explanation of articles in design], [drawings], in particular, [bottom view], [rear view], [plan view], [reference front view], [reference rear view], [reference left-side view], [reference perspective view] * [A] 3; | [A]JP2017509557 (COMPLEAT LLC)[A] 1-8 |