EP3935608 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PARKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honk Mobile Inc. 90 Eglinton Ave E, Suite 600 Toronto, ON M4P 2Y3 / CA | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LA, Tony c/o Honk Mobile Inc. 90 Eglinton Ave E, Suite 600 Toronto, Ontario M4P 2Y3 / CA | 02 /
BACK, Michael c/o Honk Mobile Inc. 90 Eglinton Ave E, Suite 600 Toronto, Ontario M4P 2Y3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
LA, Tony Toronto, Ontario M4P 2Y3 / CA | ||
02 /
BACK, Michael Toronto, Ontario M4P 2Y3 / CA | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20766303.0 | 05.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020CA50296 | Priority number, date | US201962813955P | 05.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962813955 P | US201962858532P | 07.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962858532 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176991 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935608 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/02, G06Q20/32, H04W4/021, H04W4/38, H04W80/08, G07F17/24, G06Q20/12 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
G07B15/02 (EP,US);
G06F16/9566 (US);
G06Q20/127 (EP);
G06Q20/32 (EP);
G06Q20/3224 (US);
G06Q20/326 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G07F17/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G07B15/02, G06Q20/32, H04W4/021, H04W4/38, H04W80/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN TRAKTIONSSYSTEM | [2022/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PARKING SYSTEM | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SYSTÈME DE STATIONNEMENT | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 06.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012053998 (REDMANN WILLIAM GIBBENS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2012130775 (BOGAARD ALBERT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0025] , [0029] , [0031] , [0033] , [0 35] *; | [A]US2015262241 (SHUSTER GARY STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2018130265 (KHAN MOHAMMAD [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0038] , [0 52] , [0 60] * | International search | [Y]US2015262241 (SHUSTER GARY STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 5-20 * abstract* *paragraphs [0032], [0035]-[0037])*; | [Y]WO2016084041 (BADRA MOHAMAD [FR]) [Y] 1, 2 * abstract* *page 15, line 28 - page 16, line 9* *page 21, lines 12-24*; | [A]US2017323227 (SADEGHI ARASH [US]) [A] *entire document*; | [XY]US2018130265 (KHAN MOHAMMAD [US]) [X] 3, 4 * abstract* *paragraphs [0007], [0008], [0018], [0023]-[0025], [0029], [0032], [0034], [0036], [0039]* *paragraphs [0040], [0041], [0044]-[0046], [0054], [0055], [0057], [0059], [0061]* *Figures 2A, 2B* [Y] 1, 2, 5-20; | [A]US2019043356 (SUBRAMANYA BALU [US]) [A] *entire document* |