EP3931351 - METHOD FOR TARGET ENTITY DETECTION USING LIGASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/01] | SYSTEMS, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS FOR TARGET ENTITY DETECTION | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercy Bioanalytics, Inc. 700 Main St. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDLAK, Joseph Charles 122 Columbia St. Apt 1 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
BORTOLIN, Laura Teresa 53 Churchill Street Apartment B Newtonville, Massachusetts 02460 / US | 03 /
SALEM, Daniel Parker 245 Beacon Street Unit 2 Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SEDLAK, Joseph Charles Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
02 /
BORTOLIN, Laura Teresa Newtonville, Massachusetts 02460 / US | |||
03 /
SALEM, Daniel Parker Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20766432.7 | 28.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US20529 | Priority number, date | US201962812878P | 01.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962812878 P | US202062962722P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962722 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180741 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931351 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3931351 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6804, G01N33/68, C12Q1/6816 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6804 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6862 (US);
G01N33/54306 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N33/57484 (US);
G01N33/57488 (EP);
G01N33/6854 (EP);
C12Q2521/501 (KR);
C12Q2545/101 (KR);
C12Q2600/112 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/118 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
C12Q2600/166 (US);
G01N2030/027 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2533/107 (EP);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2537/143 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/01] | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6862, C12Q1/6844, C12N15/11, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIGASE VERWENDENDES VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON TARGETMOLEKÜLE | [2024/15] | English: | METHOD FOR TARGET ENTITY DETECTION USING LIGASE | [2024/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION D'ENTITÉS CIBLE UTILISANT DE LIGASE | [2024/15] |
Former [2022/01] | SYSTEME, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZIELEINHEITSDETEKTION | ||
Former [2022/01] | SYSTEMS, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS FOR TARGET ENTITY DETECTION | ||
Former [2022/01] | SYSTÈMES, COMPOSITIONS, ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION D'ENTITÉS CIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21201011.0 / EP3998349 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015175856 (MESO SCALE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]); | [E]WO2021146659 (MERCY BIOANALYTICS INC [US]); | International search | [A]US2003118987 (CANTOR CHARLES R [US], et al); | [A]US2007275375 (VAN EIJK MICHAEL JOSEPHUS T [NL]); | [A]WO2016093838 (NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2017253916 (SCHOREY JEFFREY S [US], et al) |