EP3903498 - AN ENCODER, A DECODER, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS THAT ARE USED FOR TRANSFORM PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Han Riesstr.25 80992 München / DE | 02 /
ESENLIK, Semih Riesstr.25 80992 München / DE | 03 /
WANG, Biao Riesstr.25 80992 München / DE | 04 /
KOTRA, Anand Meher Riesstr.25 80992 München / DE | 05 /
CHEN, Jianle 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
GAO, Han 80992 München / DE | ||
02 /
ESENLIK, Semih 80992 München / DE | |||
03 /
WANG, Biao 80992 München / DE | |||
04 /
KOTRA, Anand Meher 80992 München / DE | |||
05 /
CHEN, Jianle Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20766583.7 | 12.02.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020CN74780 | Priority number, date | US201962813136P | 03.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962813136 P | US201962815293P | 07.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815293 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177509 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903498 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/60, H04N19/122, H04N19/157, H04N19/593, H04N19/625 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/122 (EP,KR);
H04N19/61 (CN,KR);
H04N19/119 (US);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/159 (CN,US);
H04N19/176 (CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04N19/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | EIN KODIERER, EIN DEKODIERER, UND FÜR EINEN UMWANDLUNGSPROZESS VERWENDETE KORRESPONDIERENDE VERFAHREN | [2021/44] | English: | AN ENCODER, A DECODER, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS THAT ARE USED FOR TRANSFORM PROCESS | [2021/44] | French: | CODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS MIS EN OEUVRE DANS UN PROCESSUS DE TRANSFORMÉE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018332289 (HUANG HAN [US]); | [E]WO2020058568 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | International search | [A]US2017195684 (KIM JUNGSUN [KR], et al); | [A]WO2017222334 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR], et al); | [A]WO2018012851 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]); | [X]CN109089117 (MEDIATEK INC); | [A]CN109417617 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST) | by applicant | US2018332289 |