EP3854097 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POINT CLOUD COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOSOUGHI, Arash c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
YEA, Sehoon c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20767107.4 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/30] | WO2020US20474 | Priority number, date | US201962812964P | 01.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962812964 P | US202016803619 | 27.02.2020 Original published format: US202016803619 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180721 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854097 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/61, H04N19/136, H04N19/91, H04N19/176, G06T7/50, G06T3/40, G06T9/00, H04N19/597, H04N19/54 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/117 (EP);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
G06T9/001 (EP);
H04N19/137 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/17 (EP);
H04N19/54 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP);
H04N13/128 (EP);
H04N13/178 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H04N19/61, H04N19/136, H04N19/91, H04N19/176, G06T7/50, G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR PUNKTWOLKENKOMPRESSION | [2021/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POINT CLOUD COMPRESSION | [2021/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA COMPRESSION D'UN NUAGE DE POINTS | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ANONYMOUS, "V-PCC Codec description", vol. ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, no. N18017; n18017, (20190109), pages 1 - 32, 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), ISO/IEC, CH, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/124_Macao/wg11/w18017.zip w18017_VPCC_TMv4_AlgorithmDescription_v1.docx, (20190109), XP030215594 [I] 1,8,15 * the whole document * | [I] - HOSSEIN NAJAF-ZADEH ET AL, "[V-PCC] Report on Core Experiment CE 2.17 on complexity reduction of geometry smoothing in TMC2", no. m44933, (20181003), 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/124_Macao/wg11/m44933-v1-m44933_CE2.17_Samsung_GeoSmooth.zip m44933_CE2.17_GeoSmoothing_v1.docx, (20181003), XP030192176 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - HOSSEIN NAJAF-ZADEH ET AL, "[V-PCC] Report on Core Experiment CE 2.17 on color pre-smoothing", no. m44932, (20181003), 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/124_Macao/wg11/m44932-v1-m44932_CE2.17_Samsung_ColorPreSmooth.zip m44932_CE2.17_ColorPreSmoothing_v3.docx, (20181003), XP030192175 [I] 8-14 * the whole document * | [IP] - ARASH VOSOUGHI ET AL, "[V-PCC] [New proposal] Selective geometry smoothing inside patches", no. m47799, (20190326), 126. MPEG MEETING; 20190325 - 20190329; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/126_Geneva/wg11/m47799-v2-m47799.zip m47799.docx, (20190326), XP030212079 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - OHJI NAKAGAMI (SONY), "PCC TMC2 low complexity geometry smoothing", no. m43501, (20180711), 123. MPEG MEETING; 20180716 - 20180720; LJUBLJANA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/123_Ljubljana/wg11/m43501-v1-m43501.zip m43501_TMC2smoothing.docx, (20180711), XP030196754 [A] 1-15 | International search | [A]US2017347120 (CHOU PHILIP A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document. *; | [A]WO2019013430 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document. *; | [A]WO2019034807 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document. *; | [EX]US10607373 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al) [EX] 1-20* ; entire document. * | by applicant | - "V-PCC Codec description", 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012, (20190109), vol. ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, no. N18017, pages 1 - 32 | - HOSSEIN NAJAF-ZADEH et al., "V-PCC] Report on Core Experiment CE 2.17 on complexity reduction of geometry smoothing in TMC2", 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO, (20181003), no. m44933, XP030192176 | - HOSSEIN NAJAF-ZADEH et al., "V-PCC] Report on Core Experiment CE 2.17 on color pre-smoothing", 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO, no. m44932 |