12.07.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
04.08.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.07.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
07.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
04.11.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
04.11.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
19.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.06.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.06.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
16.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
04.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
14.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|