Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024076599 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | US202318381368 | 18.10.2023 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | US202217636649 | 18.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11912975 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2024 | B2 | US2022298464 | 22.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7543410B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2024 | B2 | JP2022547233 | 10.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4427693 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP23185028 | 01.09.2020 | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20767504 | 01.09.2020 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4230718 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2024 | B1 | EP4230718 | 18.10.2023 | A3 | EP4230718 | 23.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20767504 | 01.09.2020 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114340723 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4025144 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | C0 | EP4025144 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | B1 | EP4025144 | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020EP74374 | 01.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021043779 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19194958 | 02.09.2019 | EP19194959 | 02.09.2019 | EP20168567 | 07.04.2020 | Type | Divisional application | EP4230718 |