EP4025144 - ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Mirai Medical Limited Unit 5 Howley Court Oranmore H91 FK6C County Galway / IE | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SODEN, Declan Dunowen, Ardfield Clonakilty, County Cork, P85 P797 / IE | 02 /
FORDE, Colin Ballyclery, Kinvara County Galway, H91 HFX2 / IE | 03 /
KINSELLA, Sean 95 Costa na Mara, Oranmore County Galway, H91 F8X5 / IE | 04 /
MOORE, Tony c/o TMC Technology Ltd. Unit 1b, Enterprise Park Inishmore, Ballincollig County Cork / IE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 20767504.2 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74374 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 25.09.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/44] | 29.09.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/44] | 29.09.2023 | Date of registration [2023/44] | 06.09.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/44] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 29.09.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/44] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025144 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 05 |