Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.04.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.12.2023 | First examination report | |
26.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
03.02.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
22.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.08.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 | Change - classification | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 | Change - classification | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
25.06.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
23.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
28.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.09.2020 | Change - representative | |
18.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |