blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3855090

EP3855090 - AIR OUTLET DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2023
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.06.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.06.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.09.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GD Midea Air-Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd.
Lingang Road
Beijiao
Shunde District
Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN
[2021/30]
Inventor(s)01 / XING, Zhigang
Lingang Road
Beijiao
Shunde
Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN
02 / ZHAO, Ali
Lingang Road
Beijiao
Shunde
Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[2021/30]
Application number, filing date20768240.213.04.2020
[2021/30]
WO2020CN84376
Priority number, dateCN20191121877429.11.2019         Original published format: CN201911218774
CN201922132569U29.11.2019         Original published format: CN 201922132569 U
[2021/30]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021103387
Date:03.06.2021
Language:ZH
[2021/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3855090
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.06.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:F24F13/15, F24F1/0018, F24F13/065
[2021/37]
CPC:
F24F13/065 (EP,US); F24F13/15 (CN); F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F1/0018 (CN); F24F13/06 (CN); F24F13/12 (CN)
Former IPC [2021/30]F24F13/15, F24F1/0018
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
TitleGerman:LUFTAUSLASSVORRICHTUNG UND KLIMAANLAGE[2021/30]
English:AIR OUTLET DEVICE AND AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS[2021/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SORTIE D'AIR ET APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION[2021/30]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2020Translation filed 
17.09.2020National basic fee paid 
17.09.2020Search fee paid 
17.09.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2020Examination requested  [2021/30]
03.03.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE3403084  (SCHULTZ GMBH AURORA) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [XI]EP0195343  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [XI]FR2673271  (CIAT SA [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [XI]US5733191  (LAM PETER K F [CA], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *[I] 2-10;
 [XI]FR2886383  (FAURECIA INTERIEUR IND SNC [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [XI]EP3015776  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [X]EP3040627  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0056] - [0187]; figures 1-11 *;
 [XI]EP3376123  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0035] - [0095]; figures 1-10 * [I] 2-8,10
International search[X]EP0393440  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1, 2, 9, 10 * description, pages 3-4, and figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2013024514  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-10 * entire document *;
 [X]CN105517821  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES) [X] 1, 3, 9, 10 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0058], figures 1-8 *;
 [X]JP6561683B  (TOYOTBOSHOKU CORP.) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0010]-[0098], figures 1-17 *;
 [A]CN110285561  (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [A] 1-10 * entire document *;
 [PX]CN110748978  (GUANGDONG MIDEA REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * entire document *;
 [PX]CN110749080  (GUANGDONG MIDEA REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-10* claims 1-10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.