EP4028410 - BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES, THE USE OF BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES, SENSORS CONTAINING ELECTRODES MODIFIED WITH THE SAID BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES AND THE DETECTION METHOD OF SARS-COV-2 VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensdx Spolka Akcyjna Potepu 14B 02-676 Warszawa / PL | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIALOBRZESKA, Wioleta Czerwony Dwór 20/16 80-376 Gdansk / PL | 02 /
BIGUS, Daniel Olsztynska 3A/11 80-395 Gdansk / PL | 03 /
CEBULA, Zofia Bulonska 14a/7 80-288 Gdansk / PL | 04 /
ZALUSKA, Izabela Wyzwolenia 29F/4 80-537 Gdansk / PL | 05 /
KRECZKO-KURZAWA, Joanna Obronców Wybrzeza 4c/102 80-398 Gdansk / PL | 06 /
MAKARUK, Marceli Genera a Józefa Bema 27/3 81-381 Gdynia / PL | 07 /
BIEDULSKA, Malgorzata Franciszka Tredera 7/1 80-297 Banino / PL | 08 /
SOSNOWSKA, Marta Zygmunta Wróblewskiego 9/15 83-000 Pruszcz Gdanski / PL | 09 /
PALA, Katarzyna Zwycieska 22/4 53-033 Wroclaw / PL | 10 /
NIDZWORSKI, Dawid Kampinoska 11 80-180 Gdansk / PL | 11 /
URBANSKI, Krzysztof Cisowa 1 55-093 Bielawa / PL | 12 /
JANICKA, Paulina Partyzantów 12 58-520 Janowice Wielkie / PL | 13 /
LEGA, Tomasz Cedrowa 17 83-032 Skowarcz / PL | 14 /
DASHKEVICH, Yanina Zakopianska 21/5 80-142 Gdansk / PL | 15 /
WÓJCIK, Kamil Kopernika 41 43-502 Czechowice-Dziedzice / PL | 16 /
HENIG, Grzegorz Wolnosci 24 58-350 Mieroszów / PL | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Matyka, Malgorzata Kancelaria Prawno-Patentowa Malgorzata Matyka ul. Zielony Stok 12/1U 80-119 Gdansk / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Matyka, Malgorzata Kancelaria Prawno-Patentowa Malgorzata Matyka Ul. Zielony Stok 12/1U 80-119 Gdansk / PL | Application number, filing date | 20768381.4 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020IB56746 | Priority number, date | PL20190431093 | 09.09.2019 Original published format: PL 43109319 | [2022/29] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048646 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028410 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/08, G01N33/543, G01N33/569 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K7/06 (EP);
C07K7/08 (EP);
G01N27/026 (US);
G01N33/54366 (EP);
G01N33/5438 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | BIOREZEPTORMOLEKÜLE, VERWENDUNG VON BIOREZEPTORMOLEKÜLEN, SENSOREN, DIE MIT DIESEN BIOREZEPTORMOLEKÜLEN MODIFIZIERTE ELEKTRODEN ENTHALTEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS DES SARS-COV-2-VIRUS | [2022/29] | English: | BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES, THE USE OF BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES, SENSORS CONTAINING ELECTRODES MODIFIED WITH THE SAID BIORECEPTOR MOLECULES AND THE DETECTION METHOD OF SARS-COV-2 VIRUS | [2022/29] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE BIORÉCEPTEUR, UTILISATION DE MOLÉCULES DE BIORÉCEPTEUR, CAPTEURS CONTENANT DES ÉLECTRODES MODIFIÉES AVEC LESDITES MOLÉCULES DE BIORÉCEPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE VIRUS SARS-COV-2 | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 05.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019155366 (SENSDX S A [PL]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A] - TRAN QUANG HUY ET AL, "A novel biosensor based on serum antibody immobilization for rapid detection of viral antigens", TALANTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 86, doi:10.1016/J.TALANTA.2011.09.012, ISSN 0039-9140, (20110909), pages 271 - 277, (20110916), XP028102651 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2011.09.012 | [A] - LAYQAH LAILA ALI ET AL, "An electrochemical immunosensor for the corona virus associated with the Middle East respiratory syndrome using an array of gold nanoparticle-modified carbon electrodes", MIKROCHIMICA ACTA, SPRINGER VERLAG, VIENNA, AT, vol. 186, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00604-019-3345-5, ISSN 0026-3672, (20190307), (20190307), XP037066726 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00604-019-3345-5 | [A] - ZUO B ET AL, "PIEZOELECTRIC IMMUNOSENSOR FOR SARS-ASSOCIATED CORONAVIRUS IN SPUTUM", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20040701), vol. 76, no. 13, doi:10.1021/AC035367B, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3536 - 3540, XP001209787 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac035367b |