EP4025412 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MATERIAL THAT IS RUFFLED OR ABLE TO BE RUFFLED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/28] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MATERIAL THAT IS GATHERED OR ABLE TO BE GATHERED | ||
[2023/42] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herrmann Ultraschalltechnik GmbH & Co. KG Descostraße 3-9 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEILER, Dave 2630 Camden Street Geneva, Illinois 60134 / US | 02 /
ROUSSEL GARCIA, Raquel Heinrich-Heyd-Strasse 7 76180 Pforzheim / DE | 03 /
ZINK, Timo Karlsruherstr. 68 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
PASTERNAK, Markus Remchinger Straße 85 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20768540.5 | 03.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74682 | Priority number, date | DE201910124006 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019124006 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043943 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025412 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025412 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B32B41/00, B32B37/06, B32B37/04 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
B32B37/04 (EP,CN);
B29C65/086 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,CN);
B29C66/21 (EP,CN);
B29C66/221 (EP,CN);
B29C66/223 (EP,CN);
B29C66/232 (EP,CN);
B29C66/433 (EP,CN);
B29C66/81422 (EP,CN);
B29C66/81435 (EP,CN);
B29C66/816 (EP,CN);
B29C66/83411 (EP,CN);
B29C66/83415 (EP);
B29C66/83511 (EP,CN);
B32B37/06 (EP,CN);
B32B37/144 (EP,CN);
B32B37/203 (EP,CN);
B32B41/00 (EP,CN);
B29K2995/0046 (EP,CN,US);
B29L2007/007 (US);
B29L2009/008 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GERAFFTEN ODER RAFFBAREN MATERIALS | [2022/28] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MATERIAL THAT IS RUFFLED OR ABLE TO BE RUFFLED | [2023/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU QUI EST PLISSÉ OU SUSCEPTIBLE D'ÊTRE PLISSÉ | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/28] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MATERIAL THAT IS GATHERED OR ABLE TO BE GATHERED | ||
Former [2022/28] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU QUI EST ASSEMBLÉ OU SUSCEPTIBLE D'ÊTRE ASSEMBLÉ | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 23.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5713399 (COLLETTE A LEON [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 25 ** figure 5 *; | [XYI]EP1529623 (RKW AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] - [0027] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 9,10,13-15 [I] 3-7,12; | [Y]US2019070041 (SCHNEIDER UWE [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0077] - [0081] - [0084] * * figures 5-6 * | by applicant | US10259165 |