EP4026218 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ELECTRICAL CONVERTER CONTROL PARAMETERS BASED ON THE MINIMISATION OF THE H-INFINITY NORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Nova Technology Limited 1110 Elliott Court Coventry Business Park Herald Avenue Coventry West Midlands CV5 6UB / GB | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAZARGAN, Masoud 1110 Elliott Court Coventry Business Park Herald Avenue Coventry West Midlands CV5 6UB / GB | 02 /
FEKRIASL, Sajjad 1110 Elliott Court Coventry Business Park Herald Avenue Coventry West Midlands CV5 6UB / GB | 03 /
KELLY, Sean 1110 Elliott Court Coventry Business Park Herald Avenue Coventry West Midlands CV5 6UB / GB | 04 /
CANELHAS, Andre Paulo 1110 Elliott Court Coventry Business Park Herald Avenue Coventry West Midlands CV5 6UB / GB | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20768678.3 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020GB52128 | Priority number, date | GB20190012729 | 04.09.2019 Original published format: GB 201912729 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021044162 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026218 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H02J3/38 (EP,CN);
H02M7/483 (GB,US);
H02J3/24 (GB);
H02J3/241 (CN);
H02M1/0012 (US);
H02M1/08 (CN);
H02M7/49 (GB);
H02M7/537 (CN);
G05B13/042 (GB);
H02M1/0003 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON STEUERPARAMETERN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN WANDLERS BASIEREND AUF DER MINIMIERUNG DER H-UNENDLICH-REGELUNG | [2022/28] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ELECTRICAL CONVERTER CONTROL PARAMETERS BASED ON THE MINIMISATION OF THE H-INFINITY NORM | [2022/28] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FOURNIR DES PARAMÈTRES DE COMMANDE DE CONVERTISSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE SUR LA BASE DE LA MINIMISATION DE LA NORME H-INFINI | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 01.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |