Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021048612 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024197697 | ![]() | 20.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418435221 | 07.02.2024 | US202016983667 | 03.08.2020 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202217826817 | 27.05.2022 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024000759 | ![]() | 04.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US202318465226 | 12.09.2023 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202016983718 | 03.08.2020 | US202117562496 | 27.12.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12257241 | ![]() | 25.03.2025 | B2 | US2024041845 | 08.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217833326 | 06.06.2022 | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US202016983689 | 03.08.2020 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | US202318491243 | 20.10.2023 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11903934 | ![]() | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2023066182 | 02.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016983667 | 03.08.2020 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202217826817 | 27.05.2022 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11833139 | ![]() | 05.12.2023 | B2 | US2023132691 | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217833326 | 06.06.2022 | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US202016983689 | 03.08.2020 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11766425 | ![]() | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2022184048 | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202016983718 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | US202117562496 | 27.12.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11351158 | ![]() | 07.06.2022 | B2 | US2021077471 | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US202016983689 | 03.08.2020 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11344537 | ![]() | 31.05.2022 | B2 | US2021077470 | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016983667 | 03.08.2020 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11207305 | ![]() | 28.12.2021 | B2 | US2021077472 | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202016983718 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220103698 | ![]() | 22.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220103697 | ![]() | 22.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022551228 | ![]() | 08.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022548858 | ![]() | 22.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022548252 | ![]() | 17.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4420673 | ![]() | 06.11.2024 | A3 | EP4420673 | 28.08.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | EP20768692 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4028000 | ![]() | 20.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4027976 | ![]() | 20.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115052597 | ![]() | 13.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114980889 | ![]() | 30.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113015519B | ![]() | 28.03.2025 | B | CN113015519 | 22.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154318 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154317 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154129 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020347536 | ![]() | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020346414 | ![]() | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020344214 | ![]() | 21.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4028001 | ![]() | 10.04.2024 | C0 | EP4028001 | ![]() | 10.04.2024 | B1 | EP4028001 | 20.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022004645 | 21.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022004659 | 21.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022004672 | 07.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2982067T | 14.10.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20240818T | 11.10.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | EP20768692 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022003075 | 11.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022003077 | 11.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12022550606 | 23.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12022550610 | 13.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | WO2020IB00645 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL4028001T | 22.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS65681 | 31.07.2024 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | EP20768692 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202400250T | 09.07.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00647 | 03.08.2020 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | EP20768692 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202203357 | 20.12.2023 | B | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | WO2020IB00648 | 03.08.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021048611 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021048610 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE066936T | 28.09.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201962899257 | 12.09.2019 | US201962941160 | 27.11.2019 | US201962902019 | 18.09.2019 | US202062977659 | 17.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | EP4420673 |