25.04.2025 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] |
18.04.2025 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2025 [2025/21] |
13.09.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
10.09.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.01.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.10.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
28.10.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
23.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.02.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.02.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
03.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
08.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
19.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|