EP4022062 - NEUROFILAMENT LIGHT CHAIN (NFL) AS A BIOMARKER FOR TRANSTHYRETIN AMYLOIDOSIS POLYNEUROPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 675 West Kendall Street Henri. A. Termeer Square Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TICAU, Simina 675 West Kendall Street Henri A. Termeer Square Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
NIOI, Paul 675 West Kendall Street Henri A. Termeer Square Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
SRIDHARAN, Gautham, Vivek 675 West Kendall Street Henri A. Termeer Square Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
TSOUR, Shira 675 West Kendall Street Henri A. Termeer Square Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20768839.1 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US48509 | Priority number, date | US201962894237P | 30.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962894237 P | US201962925623P | 24.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962925623 P | US202063044163P | 25.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063044163 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041884 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022062 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, G01N33/68, A61K31/713 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/423 (EP);
A61K31/603 (EP);
A61K31/713 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (US);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/6896 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2320/31 (EP);
G01N2333/4709 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/423, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/603, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | 21.03.2022 | ME | 21.03.2022 | Validation states | KH | 21.03.2022 | MA | 21.03.2022 | MD | 21.03.2022 | TN | 21.03.2022 | Title | German: | NEUROFILAMENTLICHTKETTE (NFL) ALS BIOMARKER FÜR DIE TRANSTHYRETIN-AMYLOIDOSE-POLYNEUROPATHIE | [2022/27] | English: | NEUROFILAMENT LIGHT CHAIN (NFL) AS A BIOMARKER FOR TRANSTHYRETIN AMYLOIDOSIS POLYNEUROPATHY | [2022/27] | French: | CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE NEUROFILAMENTAIRE (NFL) EN TANT QUE BIOMARQUEUR POUR LA POLYNEUROPATHIE LIÉE UNE AMYLOSE À TRANSTHYRÉTINE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 21.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018005967 (PROTHENA THERAPEUTICS LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-73 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2018112320 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 24-41,56-73 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2019060442 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 24-41,56-73 * the whole document * [Y] 1-73; | [Y] - ÅSA SANDELIUS ET AL, "Plasma neurofilament light chain concentration in the inherited peripheral neuropathies", NEUROLOGY, US, (20180110), vol. 90, no. 6, doi:10.1212/WNL.0000000000004932, ISSN 0028-3878, pages e518 - e524, XP055746585 [Y] 1-73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/WNL.0000000000004932 | [XD] - MERRILL D. BENSON ET AL, "Inotersen Treatment for Patients with Hereditary Transthyretin Amyloidosis", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, US, (20180705), vol. 379, no. 1, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1716793, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 22 - 31, XP055679307 [XD] 24-41,56-73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1716793 | [A] - VAN LIEVERLOO, G. ET AL., "Serum neurofilament light chain in chronic inflammatory demyelinating polyneuropathy", JOURNAL OF THE PERIPHERAL NERVOUS SYSTEM, US, (20181201), vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1111/jns.12290, ISSN 1085-9489, page 277, XP055676584 [A] 1-73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jns.12290 | [ ] - 2018 Peripheral Nerve Society Annual Meeting 21-25 July, 2018 Baltimore, Maryland | [AD] - TERESA COELHO ET AL, "Mechanism of Action and Clinical Application of Tafamidis in Hereditary Transthyretin Amyloidosis", NEUROLOGY AND THERAPY, (20160219), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s40120-016-0040-x, ISSN 2193-8253, pages 1 - 25, XP055679296 [AD] 1-73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s40120-016-0040-x | [T] - MAHIMA KAPOOR ET AL, "Plasma neurofilament light chain concentration is increased and correlates with the severity of neuropathy in hereditary transthyretin amyloidosis", JOURNAL OF THE PERIPHERAL NERVOUS SYSTEM, US, (20191014), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1111/jns.12350, ISSN 1085-9489, pages 314 - 319, XP055746563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jns.12350 | [T] - TICAU, S. ET AL., "Neurofilament light chain (NfL) as a potential biomarker in hereditary transthyretin-mediated (hATTR) amyloidosis", JOURNAL OF THE PERIPHERAL NERVOUS SYSTEM, US, (20200126), vol. 25, no. S1, doi:10.1111/jns.12361, ISSN 1085-9489, page s13, XP055746545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jns.12361 | [T] - LUIS F. MAIA ET AL, "Plasma neurofilament light chain: an early biomarker for hereditary ATTR amyloid polyneuropathy", AMYLOID, GB, (20200402), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.1080/13506129.2019.1708716, ISSN 1350-6129, pages 97 - 102, XP055746560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13506129.2019.1708716 | by applicant | WO2010048228 | WO2011139917 | WO2013075035 | WO2014179627 | WO2015085158 | WO2017023660 | - BENSON et al., N Engl J Med, (20180000), vol. 379, pages 22 - 31 | - COELHO et al., Neurol Ther., (20160000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 25 | - MAURER et al., NEJM, (20180000), vol. 379, pages 1007 - 1016 | - SAID et al., Nature Drug Disc., (20120000), vol. 11, pages 185 - 186 | - COELHO et al., Neurology, (20120000), vol. 79, pages 785 - 792 | - ROSENBLUM et al., Circ Heart Fail., (20180000), vol. 11, page e004769 | - AZORFN CONTESSE et al., Orphanet J Rare Dis., (20150000), vol. 10, no. 1, page 2 | - SOLOMON et al., Circulation, (20190122), vol. 139, no. 4, pages 431 - 443 | - BENSON et al., Am J Cardiol, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 285 - 9 | - ANDO et al., Arch Neurol, (20050000), vol. 62, pages 1057 - 62 | - ANDO et al., Orphanet J Rare Dis., (20130000), vol. 8, page 31 | - DYCK et al., Quantitating overall neuropathic symptoms, impairments, Elsevier, (20050000), pages 1031 - 52 | - DYCK et al., Neurol, (19970000), vol. 49, pages 229 - 39 | - N. SUANPRASERT et al., J Neurol Sci, (20140000), vol. 344, pages 121 - 128 | - DYCK et al., Muscle Nerve, (20030000), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 202 - 10 | - ADAMS et al., BMC Neurology, (20170000), vol. 17, no. 181 | - WITTELES et al., JACC: Heart Failure, (20190000), vol. 7, pages 709 - 716 | - DISANTO et al., Ann Neurol., (20170000), vol. 81, pages 857 - 870 | - LIN et al., Sci Rep., (20180000), vol. 8, page 17368 | - JUDGE et al., Cardiovascular Drugs and Therapy, (20200000), vol. 34, pages 357 - 370 |