EP3935563 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FACIAL RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stone Lock Global, Inc. 12635 Hemlock Street Overland Park, Kansas 66213 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRANI, James 7823 Wagon Mound Ct NW Albuquerque, New Mexico 87120 / US | 02 /
DUNLAP, David Douglas 14551 Granada Circle Leawood, Kansas 66224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
TRANI, James Albuquerque, New Mexico 87120 / US | ||
02 /
DUNLAP, David Douglas Leawood, Kansas 66224 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20769474.6 | 05.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020US21256 | Priority number, date | US201916297366 | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US201916297366 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185525 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935563 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/33, G01N21/35, G06F21/32, H04L9/08, H01L27/14, G06V10/50, G06V40/16 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/172 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/14 (KR);
G06V10/147 (US);
G06V10/467 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/50 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G06K9/03, G06K9/20, G06K9/74, G01N21/33, G01N21/35, G06F21/32, H04L9/08, H01L27/14, H01L27/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GESICHTSERKENNUNG | [2022/02] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FACIAL RECOGNITION | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 25.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2023 | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011026781 (OSADCHY MARGARITA [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2014072185 (DUNLAP DAVID D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0076] *; | [A]CN107330382 (UNIV SHENZHEN) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]CN108805027 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6219794 (SOUTAR COLIN [CA], et al) [A] 1 -20* ; entire document *; | [A]US2009002708 (MCFARLAND ERIC W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2017308740 (DUNLAP DAVID D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2018165823 (LUDWIG LESTER F [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US2011026781 | US2014072185 | CN107330382 | CN108805027 |