EP3938965 - AN APPARATUS, A METHOD AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR TRAINING A NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYTEKIN, Caglar Riihuhdankatu 13 B 6 33580 Tampere / FI | 02 /
CRICRI, Francesco Massunkuja 1 A 14 33100 Tampere / FI | 03 /
TUPALA, Miika Petäjäsuonkatu 3 D 13 33580 Tampere / FI | 04 /
NI, Xingyang Orivedenkatu 8 C 67 C 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
AYTEKIN, Caglar 33580 Tampere / FI | ||
02 /
CRICRI, Francesco 33100 Tampere / FI | |||
03 /
TUPALA, Miika 33580 Tampere / FI | |||
04 /
NI, Xingyang 33720 Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 20769523.0 | 04.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020FI50137 | Priority number, date | FI20190005190 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: FI 20195190 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020183059 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938965 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08, G06N3/02, G06T9/00, G06N3/04, H04N19/159, H04N19/192 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
H04N19/463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM TRAINIEREN EINES NEURONALEN NETZES | [2022/03] | English: | AN APPARATUS, A METHOD AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR TRAINING A NEURAL NETWORK | [2022/03] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR L'APPRENTISSAGE D'UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018322388 (O`SHEA TIMOTHY JAMES [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0125] * * figures 1-4,7 *[I] 3-9,12-15 | International search | [X]US2018184123 (TERADA KENGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0108]-[0109], [0136], [0160], [0170]; Fig. 1 *; | [X]US2018322388 (O`SHEA TIMOTHY JAMES [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract; paragraphs [0043], [0049], [0071]-[0072], [0076]-[0077], [0095]-[0096], [0099]-[0100]; Fig. 4 *; | [X] - CHEN, T. et al., "DeepCoder: A deep neural network based video compression", 2017 IEEE Visual Communications and Image Processing (VCIP) . IEEE Xplore, (20171210), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/abstract/document/8305033, (20200518), XP033325713 [X] 1-20 * sections I, II.D; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VCIP.2017.8305033 | [A] - RADOSAVOVIC, I. et al., "Data Distillation: Towards Omni-Supervised Learning", 2018 IEEE /CVF Conference on Computer Vision and Pattern Recognition . IEEE Xplore, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2018.00433, (20180618), pages 4119 - 4128, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/abstract/document/8578531, (20200520), XP033476384 [A] 1-20 * abstract; sections 3-4; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2018.00433 | by applicant | US2018322388 |