EP3934418 - ADAM17 BINDING MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325, MSC 7660 Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | For all designated states Tri-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute, Inc. Belfer Research Building 413 East 69th Street, 16th Floor, Box 300 New York NY 10021 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Thomas, Edgeworth 3 Beverly Place Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 02 /
NIKOLOV, Dimitar Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 03 /
SAHA, Nayanendu Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 04 /
ZHU, Zhongyu 2501 Carrington Way Frederick, MD 21702 / US | 05 /
DIMITROV, Dimiter, Stanchev 1019 Storrington Dr. Frederick, MD 21702 / US | 06 /
ROBEV, Dorothea Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
WHITE, Thomas, Edgeworth Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | ||
02 /
NIKOLOV, Dimitar New York, NY 10065 / US | |||
03 /
SAHA, Nayanendu New York, NY 10065 / US | |||
04 /
ZHU, Zhongyu Frederick, MD 21702 / US | |||
05 /
DIMITROV, Dimiter, Stanchev Frederick, MD 21702 / US | |||
06 /
ROBEV, Dorothea New York, NY 10065 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20769619.6 | 07.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020US21603 | Priority number, date | US201962815471P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815471 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185635 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934418 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, A61K39/00, A61K39/395 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A01K2207/12 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0331 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/80 (EP);
A61K2039/812 (EP);
A61K2039/82 (EP);
A61K39/00 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP);
C07K2317/52 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | ADAM17-BINDENDE MOLEKÜLE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/02] | English: | ADAM17 BINDING MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF | [2022/02] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON D'ADAM17 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - L. ATAPATTU ET AL, "Antibodies binding the ADAM10 substrate recognition domain inhibit Eph function", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, Cambridge, (20121029), vol. 125, no. 24, doi:10.1242/jcs.112631, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 6084 - 6093, XP055507579 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.112631 | [A] - PENG LI ET AL, "Molecular basis for the mechanism of action of an anti-TACE antibody", MABS, US, vol. 8, no. 8, doi:10.1080/19420862.2016.1226716, ISSN 1942-0862, (20160909), pages 1598 - 1605, URL: http://www.tandfonline.com/doi/pdf/10.1080/19420862.2016.1226716, XP093007747 [A] 1-15 * table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/19420862.2016.1226716 | [AP] - SAHA NAYANENDU ET AL, "ADAM proteases: Emerging role and targeting of the non-catalytic domains", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 467, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2019.10.003, ISSN 0304-3835, (20191005), pages 50 - 57, (20191005), XP085882774 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2019.10.003 | International search | [A]WO2005034733 (LONG ISLAND JEWISH RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract; Fig. 1-3 *; | [A]US2007004910 (SEXTON DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-5* para [0008]; SEQ ID NO: 148 *; | [A]US2016326257 (LOWE PETER [FR]) [A] 1-5 * claims 5-9 * |