EP3938816 - STRUCTURAL COLORANTS WITH CARBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 1350 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZORNIJ, Zenon, Paul 26701 Telegraph Road Southfield, MI 48033 / US | 02 /
TAZZIA, Charles, L. 1609 Biddle Avenue Wyandotte, MI 48912 / US | 03 /
THANKI, Paragkumar Surathkal-Bajpe Road Mangalore 575030 / IN | 04 /
SHIRMAN, Elijah 1350 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 05 /
KAY, Theresa 1350 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 06 /
AIZENBERG, Joanna 1350 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
CZORNIJ, Zenon, Paul Southfield, MI 48033 / US | ||
02 /
TAZZIA, Charles, L. Wyandotte, MI 48912 / US | |||
03 /
THANKI, Paragkumar Mangalore 575030 / IN | |||
04 /
SHIRMAN, Elijah Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
05 /
KAY, Theresa Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
06 /
AIZENBERG, Joanna Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20770257.2 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22143 | Priority number, date | US201962817182P | 12.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962817182 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185929 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938816 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/00, G02B1/04, C09D5/29, C09D7/61, C09D7/62, C09D7/40, C09D5/36 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP);
C09C1/3054 (US);
C01B33/193 (US);
C09C3/063 (US);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D5/29 (EP);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (US);
C01P2004/61 (US);
C01P2006/16 (US);
C01P2006/60 (US);
C08K3/013 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | G02B1/00, G02B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | STRUKTURELLE FARBSTOFFE MIT KOHLENSTOFF | [2022/03] | English: | STRUCTURAL COLORANTS WITH CARBON | [2022/03] | French: | COLORANTS STRUCTURAUX AVEC DU CARBONE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008141971 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,18,19 * figures 1-6; example 4; claims 1-55 *; | [Y]WO2015017722 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 11* paragraphs [0043] , [0 54] , [0 70] - [0075] - [0 90] - [0096] - [0 98] - [0100]; figures 1-8, 15-18; claims 1-12, 21-25 *; | [X]WO2016198527 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-7,18,19 * pages 23-24; figures 1-6; examples 1-6; claims 1-23 *; | [XYI] - SASCHA M. KLEIN ET AL, "Synthesis of Spherical Polymer and Titania Photonic Crystallites", LANGMUIR, US, (20050701), vol. 21, no. 15, doi:10.1021/la0469957, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 6669 - 6674, XP055421116 [X] 1-10,13-18 * paragraph "Preparation of Inverse Titania Supraparticles" on pages 6671 and 6673-6674 paragraph "Conclusions" on page 6674; page 6671 - page 6674; figures 1, 6-8 * [Y] 11 [I] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la0469957 | [X] - SCHRODEN R C ET AL, "OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF INVERSE OPAL PHOTONIC CRYSTALS", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020801), vol. 14, no. 8, doi:10.1021/CM020100Z, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 3305 - 3315, XP001164086 [X] 1,2,4-7,17 * paragraph "Synthesis of Macroporous Mercaptopropyl Silica" on page 3307; page 3307; figure 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm020100z | International search | [A]US6756115 (FU GUOYI [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 10 * Entire document *; | [A]US8889234 (KWON SUNGHOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-4, 10 * Entire document *; | [A]US8936683 (MARSHALL ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-4, 10* Entire docyment *; | [A]US2016053101 (RADICE STEFANO VINCENZO [IT], et al) [A] 1-4, 10 * Entire document *; | [X]US9279771 (AIZENBERG JOANNA [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 10 * Entire document, especially, Abstract, col 5 In 55-57; col 6 In 19-23; col 12 In 30-33; col 23 In 12-40 *; | [A]US9435050 (LI YANG YANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-4, 10 * Entire document * |