EP3938077 - POINT OF CARE CONCENTRATION ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novilux, LLC 1100 Madison Ave N Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTYN, William, E. 11546 Matsu Pl NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 02 /
NOLAND, Brian, W. 769 Via Del Sol Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 03 /
BISHOP, Jeffrey, J. 4362 Jordan Ranch Dr. Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 04 /
LIVINGSTON, Richard 468 Florance Ave Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | 05 /
ONORATO, Robert 3108 Windsor Dr. Alameda, CA 94501 / US | 06 /
GILBERT, Michele 964b Cornell Ave. Albany, CA 94706 / US | 07 /
WANG, Danni 1377 Ballena Blvd., Apt D Albany, CA 94501 / US | 08 /
KYGER, Erich 1756 Sanger Peak Way Antioch, CA 94531 / US | 09 /
JOLLY, John, David 20487 Ammon Lane Nw Poulsbo, WA 98370 / US | 10 /
MONSALVE, Luis, H. 575 Homestead LN NE, Apt. F276 Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
ORTYN, William, E. Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | ||
02 /
NOLAND, Brian, W. Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
03 /
BISHOP, Jeffrey, J. Dublin, CA 94568 / US | |||
04 /
LIVINGSTON, Richard Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | |||
05 /
ONORATO, Robert Alameda, CA 94501 / US | |||
06 /
GILBERT, Michele Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
07 /
WANG, Danni Albany, CA 94501 / US | |||
08 /
KYGER, Erich Antioch, CA 94531 / US | |||
09 /
JOLLY, John, David Poulsbo, WA 98370 / US | |||
10 /
MONSALVE, Luis, H. Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20770261.4 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22399 | Priority number, date | US201962817433P | 12.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962817433 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020186062 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938077 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/44, B01L3/00, G01F1/20, G01F1/40, G01F5/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/58, B01F29/30, B01F33/25, B01F33/30, B01F35/33, B01F35/71, G01N35/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B01L3/50273 (EP,KR);
G01N35/00069 (EP,CN,KR);
B08B3/10 (CN);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01F21/402 (EP);
B01F29/30 (EP,KR);
B01F29/60 (CN);
B01F33/251 (EP,KR);
B01F33/30 (EP,KR);
B01F33/3017 (KR);
B01F33/405 (KR);
B01F35/331 (EP,KR);
B01F35/71725 (EP);
B01L13/00 (CN);
B01L3/502753 (US);
B08B9/032 (CN);
G01F11/28 (EP,KR);
G01N33/5302 (CN);
G01N33/533 (CN);
G01N33/54326 (CN);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/62 (US);
B01F2101/23 (CN,KR);
B01L2200/04 (KR,US);
B01L2200/0668 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0663 (US);
B01L2300/0803 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0867 (US);
B01L2300/087 (US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,KR);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,KR);
B01L2400/0688 (EP);
B08B2209/032 (CN);
G01N2035/00158 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | B01D46/44, B01L3/00, G01F1/20, G01F1/40, G01F5/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/58, B01F29/30, B01F33/25, B01F33/30, B01F35/33, B01F35/71 | ||
Former IPC [2022/03] | B01D46/44, B01L3/00, G01F1/20, G01F1/40, G01F5/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | KONZENTRATIONSANALYSATOR FÜR DEN EINSATZ AM VERSORGUNGSORT | [2022/03] | English: | POINT OF CARE CONCENTRATION ANALYZER | [2022/03] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE CONCENTRATION DE POINT D'INTERVENTION | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9708556 (FIRST MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [XY]US5912134 (SHARTLE ROBERT J [US]); | [XY]EP1894617 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2008103116 (GYROS PATENT AB [SE], et al); | [XYI]JP6434114B ; | [XY]US2019011470 (OKAMOTO FUSATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2019054468 (LANDERS JAMES P [US], et al); | [P]US2019162670 (NOSE TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US2005029440 (LAURELL THOMAS [SE], et al); | [Y]US2010196908 (OPALSKY DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2012214224 (CHAN EUGENE Y [US]); | [Y]US2015064693 (KHATTAK AYUB [US], et al); | [A]US2015346097 (BATTRELL C FREDERICK [US], et al) |