EP3934809 - DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR SELECTING A TARGET ANALYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rarecyte, Inc. 2601 4th Ave, Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUARRE, Steve 2601 4th Ave, Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 02 /
SEUBERT, Ronald, C. 2601 4th Ave, Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
QUARRE, Steve Seattle, WA 98121 / US | ||
02 /
SEUBERT, Ronald, C. Seattle, WA 98121 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20770325.7 | 06.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020US21452 | Priority number, date | US201962815903P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815903 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185585 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934809 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, G01N1/14 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N35/1009 (EP,KR);
G01N1/14 (US);
B01L3/0217 (EP);
B01L2200/0673 (EP);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2200/141 (EP);
B01L2300/161 (EP);
B01L2400/0406 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
B01L3/021 (KR);
G01N2001/1418 (US);
G01N2035/1037 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES ZIELANALYTS EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2022/02] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR SELECTING A TARGET ANALYTE | [2022/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SÉLECTIONNER UN ANALYTE CIBLE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 11.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009017554 (VANN CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0025] , [0036] * * figures 1A, 2A, 6A-C, 7A-C * [I] 3,12,13; | [XI]US2016202281 (FANG QUN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-11,14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0045] , [0055] * * figure 1 * [I] 3,6,12,13,15; | [XI]US2016228869 (QUARRE STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0024] - [0026] - [0046] * * figures 2A, 2B, 2C, 2D, 8A * [I] 3,5,6,8; | [XI]DE102016220424 (HAMILTON BONADUZ AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] * * figures 2a-2c - * [I] 3,5,6,8; | [XI] - ANONYMOUS, "Crystal Pipettes Instruction Manual", WPI INC, (20091231), pages 1 - 20, XP055738566 [X] 1,2,9,10,14 * page 10 * * figure 4 * [I] 3,11-13,15 | International search | [A]US2014199216 (MORIARTY KENT GORDON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 2-3; paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2015011013 (CAMPTON DANIEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 2B; paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2016228869 (QUARRE STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; figure 2C; paragraph [0024] *; | [A]DE102016220424 (HAMILTON BONADUZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-20 * ; see machine translation *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Crystal Pipettes Instruction Manual", WPI Inc, (20090000), pages 1 - 20, XP055738566 [A] 1-20 * . * | by applicant | US2009017554 | US9222953 | US9227188 | US2016202281 | US2016228869 | US9440234 | US9519002 | US2017276575 | US9810605 | DE102016220424 | US20060088392 |