EP3937787 - PIVOT GUIDE FOR ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonic Incytes Medical Corp. 560- 828 West 10th Avenue Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONARVAR, Mohammad 560-828 West 10th Avenue Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Caitlin Marie 560-828 West 10th Avenue Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | 03 /
LOBO, Julio Raul 560-828 West 10th Avenue Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
HONARVAR, Mohammad Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | ||
02 /
SCHNEIDER, Caitlin Marie Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | |||
03 /
LOBO, Julio Raul Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9 / CA | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20770721.7 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020CA50346 | Priority number, date | US201962818599P | 14.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962818599 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020181394 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937787 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3937787 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/14, A61B90/50, A61B8/08, A61B90/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61B90/50 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4209 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/4245 (KR);
A61B8/4455 (KR);
A61B8/4488 (US);
A61B8/483 (US);
A61B8/485 (EP,KR);
A61B8/488 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/067 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | A61B8/00, A61B8/14, A61B90/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWENKFÜHRUNG FÜR ULTRASCHALLWANDLER | [2022/03] | English: | PIVOT GUIDE FOR ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCER | [2022/03] | French: | GUIDE DE PIVOT POUR TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONORE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004006773 (EAGLE ULTRASOUND AS [NO], et al); | [XAI]US2006020211 (TOKUMOTO TADAHIKO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]WO2006062867 (DIAGNOSTIC ULTRASOUND CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007093998 (SYNERON MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al); | [Y]US2009177089 (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al); | [A]WO2009146459 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US], et al); | [XY]US7819809 (KIM SEONG RAE [KR]); | [A]WO2013084093 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [Y]WO2016201006 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al); | [A]WO2018000103 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]); | [XY]US2018125455 (SALCUDEAN SEPTIMIU EDMUND [CA], et al) |