EP3928804 - HYDROGEL INCLUDING SEROTONIN-MODIFIED HYALURONIC ACID AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellartgen Inc. 50, Yonsei-ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03722 / KR | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Seung Woo Seocho Raemian Apt., Seocho-dong) 106-2304, 13- 10, Seocho-daero 65-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06602 / KR | 02 /
AN, Soo Hwan Hyoseong Apt., Pyeongnae-dong) 105-1907, 34, Gyeongchun-ro 1350beon-gil Namyangju-si, Gyeonggi-do 12219 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
CHO, Seung Woo Seoul 06602 / KR | ||
02 /
AN, Soo Hwan Namyangju-si, Gyeonggi-do 12219 / KR | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20770858.7 | 13.03.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020KR03549 | Priority number, date | KR20190029214 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190029214 | [2021/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020185041 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3928804 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00, A61L24/08, A61L27/52, A61L27/38, C12N5/00, A61K9/06, A61L27/54, C08L5/08, C08B37/08, A61K47/36, A61K47/61, A61K47/69, C08J3/075, A61L27/20, A61L27/58 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP);
A61L24/0031 (EP,CN,KR);
C08J3/075 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K47/36 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K47/545 (CN,US);
A61K47/61 (EP);
A61K47/6903 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61L24/0015 (EP,KR);
A61L24/0042 (EP,KR);
A61L24/08 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L27/20 (EP);
A61L27/3895 (KR);
A61L27/52 (EP,KR);
A61L27/58 (EP);
C08B37/0072 (EP,CN,KR);
C08J3/24 (CN,KR);
C08L5/08 (EP);
C12N5/0012 (EP);
C12N5/0062 (EP,KR);
C12N5/0068 (EP);
A61K35/12 (EP);
A61L2400/04 (EP,KR);
C08J2305/08 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N2513/00 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/08, C08L5/08 (EP);
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/52] | A61L24/00, A61L24/08, A61L27/52, A61L27/38, C12N5/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/70, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | HYDROGEL MIT SEROTONIN-MODIFIZIERTER HYALURONSÄURE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/52] | English: | HYDROGEL INCLUDING SEROTONIN-MODIFIED HYALURONIC ACID AND USE THEREOF | [2021/52] | French: | HYDROGEL COMPRENANT DE L'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE MODIFIÉ AU MOYEN DE SÉROTONINE ET SON UTILISATION | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | Translation filed | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013127374 (CONTIPRO BIOTECH SRO [CZ]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,12,14,15,18,20 * page 5, lines 1-33 * * page 10, lines 7-20 * * claim - *[I] 2,7,11,13,16,17,19 | International search | [XY]KR20140127286 (CONTIPRO BIOTECH SRO [CZ]) [X] 1, 4, 5-9 * See claims 1-11; and paragraphs [0020]-[0098]. * [Y] 2, 3, 10-20; | [A]KR20170136178 (IUCF-HYU (INDUSTRY-UNIVERSITY COOPERATION FOUND HANYANG UNIVERSITY) [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A]WO2018098299 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-20* See the entire document. *; | [Y]WO2018143736 (AMTIXBIO CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2, 3, 10-20 * See paragraphs [130]-[166]. *; | [A]KR20180105090 (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR101040561B | KR20140127286 | - MELTZER, Neuropsychopharmacology, (19990000), vol. 21, pages 106S - 115S | - BARNESSHARP, Neuropharmacology, (19990000), vol. 38, pages 1083 - 1152 | - GLENNON, Neurosci. Biobehavioral Rev., (19900000), vol. 14, page 35 |