EP4034436 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING-BRAKE VALVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Europe BV Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Brüssel / BE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUPPERT, Fabian Wilhelm-Busch-Straße 19 31515 Wunstorf / DE | 02 /
DÜCKMANN, Rudolf Wachtelstieg 15 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 03 /
KRAUS, Hauke Lyraweg 7 30455 Hannover / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20771218.3 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP74281 | Priority number, date | DE201910125747 | 25.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019125747 | [2022/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058234 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034436 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4034436 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68, B60T13/66, B60T17/22, B60T8/17, B60T13/04 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B60T13/683 (EP,CN,US);
B60T13/385 (US);
B60T13/04 (EP,CN);
B60T13/662 (CN);
B60T17/002 (US);
B60T17/085 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHE PARKBREMSVENTILEINHEIT | [2022/31] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PARKING-BRAKE VALVE UNIT | [2022/31] | French: | UNITÉ DE SOUPAPE DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE102005058799 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,14-17 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 46] - [0048] - [0 59] , [0 62] - [0066]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-5,9-11,13 [I] 12; | [A]WO2008122382 (WABCO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0012] , [0 23] - [0052]; figure 1 * |