EP4005190 - DATA LINK OPERATING METHOD, DATA TRANSMISSION UNIT, AND VEHICLE WITH DATA TRANSMISSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORSCH, Roland Ganghoferstr. 11 95469 Speichersdorf / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20771450.2 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP73799 | Priority number, date | DE201910214476 | 23.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019214476 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058219 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005190 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W4/40, H04W28/02, H04L12/815, H04L12/841 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L47/22 (EP);
H04L47/28 (EP);
H04L67/04 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04L67/06 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | DATENVERBINDUNGBETRIEBSVERFAHREN, DATENÜBERMITTLUNGSEINHEIT UND FAHRZEUG MIT DATENÜBERMITTLUNGSEINHEIT | [2022/22] | English: | DATA LINK OPERATING METHOD, DATA TRANSMISSION UNIT, AND VEHICLE WITH DATA TRANSMISSION UNIT | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE LIAISON DE DONNÉES, UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2012327787 (MOHAMMED JAHANGIR [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] , [0055] , [0057] , [0066] , [0068] , [0072] , [0086] , [0095] , [0097] , [0109] *; | [I]US2013016624 (LI XIANGYANG [CN], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0017] - [0027] * * figure 5 *; | [XI]US2013196621 (GUDAY SHAI [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-8,12,15; | [A]EP3107243 (HEADWATER PARTNERS I LLC [US]) [A] 3,4,6-9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0030] - [0033] , [0039] , [0074] , [0185] , [0188] , [0231] - [0243] *; | [A]US2017070616 (DIMEO DAVID [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,10,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0023] - [0027] - [0032] - [0032] - [0035] , [0046] , [0051] *; | [A]US2018249017 (KARAM MOHAMMED M [US]) [A] 3,4,7,14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0021] - [0022] - [0037] - [0043] - [0070] * |