EP4031454 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING A CONTAINER BY FOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRETTE, Damien C/O Sidel Packing Solutions 87 route de Seurre 21910 Corcelles-lès-Cîteaux / FR | 02 /
PRIEUR, Arnaud C/O Sidel Packing Solutions 87 route de Seurre 21910 Corcelles-lès-Cîteaux / FR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Sidel Group c/o Sidel Engineering & Conveying Solutions 5-7 Rue du Commerce, ZI CS 73445 Reichstett 67455 Mundolsheim Cedex / FR | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20771561.6 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020EP75768 | Priority number, date | FR20190010202 | 16.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1910202 | [2022/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052961 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031454 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/20, B31B50/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
B31B50/0042 (EP,US);
B65D5/061 (CN);
B65B7/20 (EP,CN,US);
B65B11/004 (EP,US);
B65B11/105 (EP,US);
B65B11/12 (EP,US);
B65B43/126 (EP,US);
B65B43/24 (CN);
B65B49/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEHÄLTERS DURCH FALTEN | [2022/30] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING A CONTAINER BY FOLDING | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FORMAGE DE CONTENEUR PAR PLIAGE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1231147 (BAUMER SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3-6,8-12 * the whole document * [I] 2,7; | [A]EP2236425 (PROCESS S R L [IT]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]CN105947261 (SHANGHAI JINQIAN MACHINERY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1,4-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0849176 | DE102011016857 |